NY S05684 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5684A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-11 - PRINT NUMBER 5684A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division of criminal justice services to establish a program for the care of retired law enforcement dogs which shall cover the cost of veterinary care for retired law enforcement dogs for the remainder of the lifetime of such dogs.
Title
Directs the division of criminal justice services to establish a program for the care of retired law enforcement dogs which shall cover the cost of veterinary care for retired law enforcement dogs for the remainder of the lifetime of such dogs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5684A |
2024-04-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-04-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10255 (Same As) 2024-05-15 - referred to codes