NY S05682 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.254
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to allowing telephone calls for inmates after transfer from correctional facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to allowing telephone calls for inmates after transfer from correctional facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-21AssemblySIGNED CHAP.254
2017-08-09SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2017-06-15Assemblyreturned to senate
2017-06-15Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading cal.153
2017-06-15Assemblysubstituted for a1730
2017-06-14Assemblyreferred to correction
2017-06-14SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-14SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-05-22SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1071
2017-05-22SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-16SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2017-04-25SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A01730 (Same As) 2017-06-15 - substituted by s5682

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback