NY S05677 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the removal of a criminal action to another criminal court in the same county or an adjoining county that has been designated a veterans treatment court by the chief administrator of the courts.
Title
Provides for the removal of a criminal action to another criminal court in the same county or an adjoining county that has been designated a veterans treatment court by the chief administrator of the courts.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Michael Nozzolio [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. William Larkin [R] |
Sen. Robert Ortt [R] | Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.501 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1580 |
2015-06-15 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |