NY S05676 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - SIGNED CHAP.513
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the department of health and mental hygiene in a city having a population of one million or more to issue a performance summary card to each child care service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the department of health and mental hygiene in a city having a population of one million or more to issue a performance summary card to each child care service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-31AssemblySIGNED CHAP.513
2016-12-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2016-06-14Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2016-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading cal.547
2016-06-14Assemblysubstituted for a8182a
2016-06-02Assemblyreferred to children and families
2016-06-02SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-06-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1256
2016-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2016-05-27SenatePRINT NUMBER 5676A
2016-05-27SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2016-01-06SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
2016-01-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-01-06Assemblydied in assembly
2015-06-09Assemblyreferred to children and families
2015-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2015-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2015-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1383
2015-06-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2015-05-27SenateREFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES

Same As/Similar To

A08182 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s5676a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback