NY S05671 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Describes the role of the ignition interlock monitor as well as requirements of people charged with violations that require the installation of an ignition interlock device to comply with court orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Describes the role of the ignition interlock monitor as well as requirements of people charged with violations that require the installation of an ignition interlock device to comply with court orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-11SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5671A
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1080
2019-05-10SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A07494 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - print number 7494a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback