NY S05671 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.182
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the allowable amount of a letter of credit used as guarantee of performance of a state procurement contract.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the allowable amount of a letter of credit used as guarantee of performance of a state procurement contract.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17AssemblyVETOED MEMO.182
2012-12-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-11Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-11Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-11Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.99
2012-06-11Assemblysubstituted for a8461a
2012-05-15Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2012-05-15SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-05-15SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-05-14SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-05-09Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-08Senate1ST REPORT CAL.734
2012-02-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 5671A
2012-02-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2012-01-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-01-04Assemblydied in assembly
2011-06-16Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2011-06-16SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-06-16SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-06-16SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1330
2011-06-16SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2011-06-09SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A08461 (Same As) 2012-06-11 - substituted by s5671a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback