NY S05665 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to granting peace officer status to traffic enforcement officers and traffic enforcement agents employed by the city of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to granting peace officer status to traffic enforcement officers and traffic enforcement agents employed by the city of New York.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-03-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-03-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.630
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CODES
2017-06-21SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2017-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-05-10Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-09Senate1ST REPORT CAL.923
2017-04-24SenateREFERRED TO CODES

Same As/Similar To

A06468 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to codes

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback