NY S05664 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-08 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4720
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain public employees to be on the site for the duration of public works projects completed by contractors; requires such certain public employees to review a contractor's work on public works projects and determine whether the work performed is acceptable.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain public employees to be on the site for the duration of public works projects completed by contractors; requires such certain public employees to review a contractor's work on public works projects and determine whether the work performed is acceptable.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A4720
2023-05-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1198
2023-03-13SenateREFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS

Same As/Similar To

A04720 (Same As) 2023-12-08 - tabled

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback