NY S05663 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3202C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3202C
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows patients to receive certain treatment by an occupational therapist without a referral from a physician or nurse practitioner; requires the occupational therapist to inform the patient of certain potential insurance issues; relates to eliminating the need for referrals for certain treatment under coverage provided by certain motor vehicle insurance policies.
Title
Allows patients to receive certain treatment by an occupational therapist without a referral from a physician or nurse practitioner; requires the occupational therapist to inform the patient of certain potential insurance issues; relates to eliminating the need for referrals for certain treatment under coverage provided by certain motor vehicle insurance policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3202C |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1240 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-05-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5663A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03202 (Same As) 2022-11-21 - signed chap.601