NY S05661 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.229
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-18 - VETOED MEMO.229
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the enhanced safety net hospital program to provide for the payment, solely by the state, of enhanced medical assistance payments to hospitals which serve the uninsured or recipients of medical assistance, are public sector hospitals, or are federally designated as critical access or sole community hospitals.
Title
Establishes the enhanced safety net hospital program to provide for the payment, solely by the state, of enhanced medical assistance payments to hospitals which serve the uninsured or recipients of medical assistance, are public sector hospitals, or are federally designated as critical access or sole community hospitals.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Little [R] | Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John Bonacic [R] |
Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-18 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.229 |
2017-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.506 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7763 |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1283 |
2017-05-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5661B |
2017-05-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5661A |
2017-05-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07763 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5661b