NY S05660 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-25 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the empire engineers initiative act; provides partial student loan repayment for students who are employed as engineers in the state of New York for five years following their graduation.
Title
Enacts the empire engineers initiative act; provides partial student loan repayment for students who are employed as engineers in the state of New York for five years following their graduation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-01-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5660A |
2014-01-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07811 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - print number 7811a