NY S05635 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-23 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes pharmacists to administer injections for contraceptive use.
Title
Authorizes pharmacists to administer injections for contraceptive use.
Sponsors
Sen. Lea Webb [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] |
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2024-05-23 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-23 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.656 |
2024-01-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5635A |
2024-01-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2023-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08881 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - referred to higher education