NY S05631 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - PRINT NUMBER 5631C
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-20 - PRINT NUMBER 5631C
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing cost-of-living adjustments; increases benefits from fifty to one hundred percent.
Title
Relates to providing cost-of-living adjustments; increases benefits from fifty to one hundred percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5631C |
2022-01-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-06-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5631B |
2021-06-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5631A |
2021-05-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10037 (Same As) 2022-04-29 - referred to governmental employees