NY S05630 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires discrimination, bias, and harassment prevention training for members of state boards and commissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires discrimination, bias, and harassment prevention training for members of state boards and commissions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-06SenateRECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2024-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2023-06-05Assemblyreferred to governmental operations
2023-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1573
2023-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-06-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 5630A
2023-06-02SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2023-03-09SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback