NY S05630 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 5630A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - PRINT NUMBER 5630A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to age and service eligibility requirements for ordinary retirement for members of the unified court system; restores 55/30 for all members; reduces the retirement age from 63 to 62.
Title
Relates to age and service eligibility requirements for ordinary retirement for members of the unified court system; restores 55/30 for all members; reduces the retirement age from 63 to 62.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5630A |
2022-01-25 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06634 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - reported referred to ways and means