NY S05627 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expands customer access to community distributed generation by creating a model tariff to provide for the transfer of bill credits associated with electricity produced by community distributed generation facilities in one electric corporation territory to other territories.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expands customer access to community distributed generation by creating a model tariff to provide for the transfer of bill credits associated with electricity produced by community distributed generation facilities in one electric corporation territory to other territories.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-13SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-13SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-29Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.887
2019-05-09SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07286 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback