NY S05626 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.345
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.345
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Saratoga and the Saratoga County Water Authority to transfer certain lands.
Title
Authorizes the county of Saratoga and the Saratoga County Water Authority to transfer certain lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.345 |
2015-09-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.557 |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a7293b |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2015-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1683 |
2015-06-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2015-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5626B |
2015-06-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5626A |
2015-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2015-05-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A07293 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5626b