NY S05618 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5618B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-10 - PRINT NUMBER 5618B
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires physicians and hospitals to obtain the name of the school attended by school-aged patients and to include this information in their admission registration forms.
Title
Requires physicians and hospitals to obtain the name of the school attended by school-aged patients and to include this information in their admission registration forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5618B |
2020-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5618A |
2020-01-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2019-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A06023 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - amended on third reading 6023b