NY S05612 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4915A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions relating to the mortgage tax in the county of Yates until December 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions relating to the mortgage tax in the county of Yates until December 1, 2025.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-23SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A4915A
2023-05-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-05-16Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-05-15Senate1ST REPORT CAL.919
2023-03-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 5612A
2023-03-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-03-08SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04915 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - signed chap.286

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback