NY S05612 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.536
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to protection of certain streams; adds class C streams to the list of protected streams.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to protection of certain streams; adds class C streams to the list of protected streams.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.536
2019-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a8349
2019-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2019-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1695
2019-06-19SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2019-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 5612A
2019-06-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION
2019-05-09SenateREFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION

Same As/Similar To

A04666 (Same As) 2019-06-11 - ordered to third reading rules cal.126
A08349 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - substituted by s5612a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback