NY S05608 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Waives the residency requirement for certain county attorney positions within Essex county including assistant public defender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waives the residency requirement for certain county attorney positions within Essex county including assistant public defender.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Investigations And Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.488
2024-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a6812c
2024-05-28Assemblyreferred to local governments
2024-05-28SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-28SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-20SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5608C
2024-03-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-03-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-03-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.706
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2023-06-10SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-30SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5608B
2023-05-23SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5608A
2023-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2023-04-26Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2023-04-25Senate1ST REPORT CAL.701
2023-03-08SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A06812 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s5608c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5608
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05608&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05608
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05608&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05608A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05608&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05608B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05608&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05608C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5608#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5608#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S5608#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05608&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback