NY S05607 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - SIGNED CHAP.489
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - SIGNED CHAP.489
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a taxpayer assistance authorization for households in the county of Schenectady; provides for a $250 rebate for property owners in Schenectady county with a qualifying STAR exemption or school tax relief credit.
Title
Provides for a taxpayer assistance authorization for households in the county of Schenectady; provides for a $250 rebate for property owners in Schenectady county with a qualifying STAR exemption or school tax relief credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.489 |
2023-09-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.578 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a5346a |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1378 |
2023-05-30 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5607A |
2023-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2023-03-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A05346 (Same As) 2023-06-06 - substituted by s5607a