NY S05598 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires employers to disclose compensation or range of compensation to applicants and employees upon issuing an employment opportunity for internal or public viewing or upon employee request.
Title
Requires employers to disclose compensation or range of compensation to applicants and employees upon issuing an employment opportunity for internal or public viewing or upon employee request.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-25 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5598D |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1287 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5598C |
2022-05-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2021-09-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5598B |
2021-09-15 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2021-04-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5598A |
2021-04-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2021-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A06529 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - amended on third reading 6529b