NY S05598 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-16 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-16 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Outlines when certain vehicles shall be considered an emergency ambulance service vehicle; provides that every vehicle operated for emergency medical service purposes owned by an entity or agency of the state, a public authority, a county, town, city or village certified pursuant to section three thousand five of the public health law to operate an ambulance or advance life support first response service, for the purposes of section one hundred one of the vehicle and traffic law shall be considered an emergency ambulance service vehicle.
Title
Outlines when certain vehicles shall be considered an emergency ambulance service vehicle; provides that every vehicle operated for emergency medical service purposes owned by an entity or agency of the state, a public authority, a county, town, city or village certified pursuant to section three thousand five of the public health law to operate an ambulance or advance life support first response service, for the purposes of section one hundred one of the vehicle and traffic law shall be considered an emergency ambulance service vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-05-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.678 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-06-20 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2011-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1396 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09935 (Same As) 2012-04-24 - referred to transportation