NY S05589 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3771A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that state aid may be provided for up to 90% of the total project approved costs for buildings of public libraries that are located in an economically distressed community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that state aid may be provided for up to 90% of the total project approved costs for buildings of public libraries that are located in an economically distressed community.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A3771A
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1048
2019-05-08SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A03771 (Same As) 2019-10-22 - signed chap.381

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback