NY S05584 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-19 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for registered and certified pharmacy technicians; requires persons working in a pharmacy who directly assist licensed pharmacists to dispense prescriptions or have authority to add or to modify prescription records maintained in the pharmacy computer system to be registered or certified as a pharmacy technician.
Title
Establishes requirements for registered and certified pharmacy technicians; requires persons working in a pharmacy who directly assist licensed pharmacists to dispense prescriptions or have authority to add or to modify prescription records maintained in the pharmacy computer system to be registered or certified as a pharmacy technician.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2018-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1837 |
2018-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1795 |
2017-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5584B |
2017-06-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-04-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5584A |
2017-04-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2017-04-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04611 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to higher education