NY S05581 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Non-Degree Proprietary School Supervision and Student Protection Act.
Title
Establishes the Non-Degree Proprietary School Supervision and Student Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-05-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5581A |
2019-05-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08170 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education