NY S05581 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5581A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5581A
Pending: Senate Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the recycling of lead-acid batteries by removing the cap on the incentive payment charged by retailers of such batteries.
Title
Relates to the recycling of lead-acid batteries by removing the cap on the incentive payment charged by retailers of such batteries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5581A |
2016-03-08 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1086 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |