NY S05576 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8614B
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the definition of an artist and theatrical employment agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the definition of an artist and theatrical employment agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A8614B
2012-06-18SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5576B
2012-06-04SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5576A
2012-01-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-01-19Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-01-18Senate1ST REPORT CAL.72
2012-01-04SenateREFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION
2012-01-04Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-01-04Assemblydied in assembly
2011-06-20Assemblyreferred to labor
2011-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2011-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2011-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1395
2011-06-03SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A07783 (Same As) 2011-07-11 - enacting clause stricken
A08614 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - signed chap.460

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback