NY S05575 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.117
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.117
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to notification of a security breach; includes credit and debit cards; increases civil penalties.
Title
Relates to notification of a security breach; includes credit and debit cards; increases civil penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.117 |
2019-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.135 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a5635b |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 5575B |
2019-06-13 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-13 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1094 |
2019-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5575A |
2019-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
Same As/Similar To
A05635 (Same As) 2019-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.117