NY S05571 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any state agency or public authority from contracting for goods or services with a contractor or a subsidiary thereof, when the contractor or subsidiary also provides consulting services or products relating to the activity for which the state agency or public authority seeks to contract.
Title
Prohibits any state agency or public authority from contracting for goods or services with a contractor or a subsidiary thereof, when the contractor or subsidiary also provides consulting services or products relating to the activity for which the state agency or public authority seeks to contract.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-04-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-04-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.794 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1958 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |