NY S05570 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-25 - SIGNED CHAP.104
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office of general services to install and maintain a commemorative plaque in the capitol honoring Samuel J. Abbott.
Title
Directs the office of general services to install and maintain a commemorative plaque in the capitol honoring Samuel J. Abbott.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.104 |
2017-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.447 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7731 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1013 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07731 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - substituted by s5570