NY S05562 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to degree-granting proprietary colleges; creates the proprietary college tuition reimbursement account for the refund of tuition paid by eligible students asserting certain violations; establishes an assessment to be paid by proprietary schools to fund the account.
Title
Relates to degree-granting proprietary colleges; creates the proprietary college tuition reimbursement account for the refund of tuition paid by eligible students asserting certain violations; establishes an assessment to be paid by proprietary schools to fund the account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Higher Education Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5562A |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08119 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to higher education