NY S05556 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5556A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5556A
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of the regional state park police.
Title
Relates to establishing a twenty year retirement plan for members or officers of the regional state park police.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] |
Sen. James Skoufis [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5556A |
2020-03-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2019-05-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06990 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - print number 6990a