NY S05556 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - PRINT NUMBER 5556A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-07 - PRINT NUMBER 5556A
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definitions of pet dealer; decreases the number of animals a person can distribute to fit under the exemption.
Title
Amends the definitions of pet dealer; decreases the number of animals a person can distribute to fit under the exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5556A |
2018-03-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO AGRICULTURE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2017-04-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A00465 (Same As) 2018-03-19 - amended on third reading 465a