NY S05551 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - SIGNED CHAP.252
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Port Chester to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Michael Sprague who is employed by such village.
Title
Authorizes the village of Port Chester to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Police Officer Michael Sprague who is employed by such village.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.252 |
2017-08-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.501 |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7507 |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2017-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1894 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07507 (Same As) 2017-06-20 - substituted by s5551