NY S05549 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - ordered to third reading rules cal.482
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to maintaining the continued viability of the state's existing large-scale, renewable energy resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to maintaining the continued viability of the state's existing large-scale, renewable energy resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Energy and Telecommunications Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.482
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a7275c
2018-06-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-31SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 5549C
2018-05-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-16Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1289
2018-01-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 5549B
2018-01-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2018-01-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-01-03Assemblydied in assembly
2017-06-21Assemblyreferred to energy
2017-06-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2017-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2017-06-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2017-06-05Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2017-05-24Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1352
2017-05-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 5549A
2017-05-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS
2017-04-10SenateREFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07275 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s5549c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05549&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05549&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05549
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05549&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05549A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05549&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05549B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S05549&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S05549C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5549#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5549#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5549#SC2
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S5549#SF2

Bill Comments

feedback