NY S05544 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.708
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Jaime Laczko to elect to participate in the optional 25 year retirement plan for forest rangers.
Title
Authorizes Jaime Laczko to elect to participate in the optional 25 year retirement plan for forest rangers.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.708 |
2021-12-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.694 |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7964 |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-26 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1345 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07964 (Same As) 2021-06-09 - substituted by s5544