NY S05544 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LABOR
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits an employer from requesting or requiring that an employee or applicant disclose any user name, password, or other means for accessing a personal account or service through specified electronic communications devices.
Title
Prohibits an employer from requesting or requiring that an employee or applicant disclose any user name, password, or other means for accessing a personal account or service through specified electronic communications devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2019-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5544A |
2019-06-05 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A02479 (Same As) 2020-07-20 - REFERRED TO RULES