NY S05543 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.611
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.611
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to military enhanced recognition, incentive and tribute scholarships; removes the date requirement of on and after August 2, 1990 for a member of the armed forces of the United States or state organized militia to be a member and for children, spouses and financial dependents of such member to receive such scholarships.
Title
Relates to military enhanced recognition, incentive and tribute scholarships; removes the date requirement of on and after August 2, 1990 for a member of the armed forces of the United States or state organized militia to be a member and for children, spouses and financial dependents of such member to receive such scholarships.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-11 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.611 |
2021-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.621 |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a7685 |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-03 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-20 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1200 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-04-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5543A |
2021-04-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2021-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A07685 (Same As) 2021-06-08 - substituted by s5543a