NY S05540 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-29 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-29 - DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Mount Van Hoevenberg Olympic Sports Complex in Essex County.
Title
Relates to the Mount Van Hoevenberg Olympic Sports Complex in Essex County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.682 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a2452 |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-05-31 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1243 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-03-10 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2023-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02452 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - substituted by s5540