NY S05540 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-11 - SIGNED CHAP.407
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of general services to place a POW/MIA chair and plaque in the capitol to honor United States prisoners of war and those still missing in action.
Title
Directs the commissioner of general services to place a POW/MIA chair and plaque in the capitol to honor United States prisoners of war and those still missing in action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.407 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.237 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a7506 |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1012 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07506 (Same As) 2017-06-14 - substituted by s5540