NY S05536 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the issuance and display of a TNC driver identification card which includes such driver's name, photograph and license plate number, and additionally requires each TNC vehicle to display an illuminated sign indicating the TNC for which the TNC driver is providing the TNC service or TNC prearranged trip; requires rules to implement a machine-readable code or image.
Title
Requires the issuance and display of a TNC driver identification card which includes such driver's name, photograph and license plate number, and additionally requires each TNC vehicle to display an illuminated sign indicating the TNC for which the TNC driver is providing the TNC service or TNC prearranged trip; requires rules to implement a machine-readable code or image.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5536C |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5536B |
2019-06-06 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5536A |
2019-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07219 (Same As) 2020-02-10 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION