NY S05536 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts provisions to provide for and assist in the expansion of natural gas service in this state for environmental and economic benefit.
Title
Enacts provisions to provide for and assist in the expansion of natural gas service in this state for environmental and economic benefit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1077 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5536C |
2014-01-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-01-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5536B |
2014-01-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2013-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1037 |
2013-06-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-05-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5536A |
2013-05-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2013-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07900 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken