NY S05517 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A743A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain contractor, subcontractor and worker certifications for certain contracts which involve industrial painting or industrial coating work.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain contractor, subcontractor and worker certifications for certain contracts which involve industrial painting or industrial coating work.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A743A
2021-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1644
2021-06-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-06-03SenatePRINT NUMBER 5517A
2021-06-03SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS
2021-03-09SenateREFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS

Same As/Similar To

A00743 (Same As) 2021-11-15 - signed chap.613

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback