NY S05515 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on November 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the date of adjustment and amount of the spousal maintenance cap; increases the income cap to $84,000 of the payor's annual income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the date of adjustment and amount of the spousal maintenance cap; increases the income cap to $84,000 of the payor's annual income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-08SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2019-06-03Assemblyreturned to senate
2019-06-03Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.446
2019-06-03Assemblysubstituted for a7518
2019-05-22Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2019-05-22SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-05-22SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-05-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-15Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-14Senate1ST REPORT CAL.706
2019-05-03SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A07518 (Same As) 2019-06-03 - substituted by s5515

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback