NY S05512 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-02 - referred to higher education
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the New York state masters-in-education teacher incentive scholarship program.
Title
Relates to the New York state masters-in-education teacher incentive scholarship program.
Sponsors
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Thomas Croci [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] |
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-02 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2016-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.376 |
2016-02-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5512A |
2016-02-12 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2015-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2015-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1290 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07727 (Same As) 2016-02-17 - print number 7727a