NY S05509 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - PRINT NUMBER 5509A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-02 - PRINT NUMBER 5509A
Pending: Senate Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to verification of claims made under the comprehensive motor vehicle insurance reparations act.
Title
Relates to verification of claims made under the comprehensive motor vehicle insurance reparations act.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Martin Golden [R] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] |
Sen. Jose Peralta [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5509A |
2018-05-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A03571 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - print number 3571a