NY S05505 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-29 - SIGNED CHAP.437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing an increased death benefit for the survivors of Theodore Raffel.
Title
Relates to providing an increased death benefit for the survivors of Theodore Raffel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.437 |
2017-11-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.648 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7069 |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2017-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1487 |
2017-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-04-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07069 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s5505