NY S05496 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3939
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to requiring a particularized and specific justification for denial of access to records under the freedom of information law, exemption from disclosure under the freedom of information law of certain law enforcement related records and to records identifying victims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to requiring a particularized and specific justification for denial of access to records under the freedom of information law, exemption from disclosure under the freedom of information law of certain law enforcement related records and to records identifying victims.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A3939
2019-05-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-05-14Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-05-13Senate1ST REPORT CAL.654
2019-05-03SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A03939 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback